Global Patent Index - EP 0771950 B1

EP 0771950 B1 2002-11-20 - A method for protecting a turbo compressor from operating in an unstable range by means of valves having two actuating speeds

Title (en)

A method for protecting a turbo compressor from operating in an unstable range by means of valves having two actuating speeds

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schutz eines Turbokompressors vor Betrieb im instabilen Arbeitsbereich mittels Armaturen mit zwei Stellgeschwindigkeiten

Title (fr)

Procédé de protection d'un turbo compresseur contre l'opération dans un domaine instable au moyen de vannes ayant deux vitesses de réglage

Publication

EP 0771950 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115284 A

Priority

DE 19541192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0771950A1] The method involves deriving a control parameter from measured values for at least the compressor throughflow and pressure, and from predetermined reference values, in order to regulate the opening of the blower using a pump limiting controller. The controller couples the measured values for the temperature, throughflow, and pressure to a dynamic bleed characteristic line (42), and drives both bleed elements (3,4) in the device in sequence. The signal for a rapid opening of both elements is sent first to a small blowing element (3), and after the opening of the latter, to a large blowing element (4). The controller has data to determine the compressor working point motion in the direction of the pumping limit, and if this motion is slow the elements are driven in sequence, and if it is rapid they are adjusted simultaneously.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/023 (2013.01); F04D 27/0223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0771950 A1 19970507; EP 0771950 B1 20021120; DE 19541192 A1 19970515; DE 19541192 C2 19990204; US 5762468 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070924

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070924

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070924

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609882 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A METHOD FOR PROTECTING A TURBO COMPRESSOR FROM OPERATING IN AN UNSTABLE RANGE BY MEANS OF VALVES HAVING TWO ACTUATING SPEEDS

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG GHH BORSIG

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GHH BORSIG TURBOMASCHINEN GMBH

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL