Global Patent Index - EP 0772007 A3

EP 0772007 A3 2000-05-03 - Jet fan

Title (en)

Jet fan

Title (de)

Strahllüfter

Title (fr)

Ventilateur à jet d'air

Publication

EP 0772007 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96117214 A

Priority

JP 28128295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0772007A2] A jet fan includes a generally cylindrical casing (1), an electric motor (2) accommodated therein, an impeller (3) connected to the electric motor (2), and at least one booster ring (8) disposed concentrically with the casing (1) and located downstream thereof with respect to a direction of an air flow. The booster ring (8) has an aerofoil or arcuated plate sectional profile as viewed in a direction transverse to a longitudinal axis of the casing (1). The booster ring (8) has an upper surface of aerofoil or arcuated plate sectional profile as its inner surface, and also has a leading edge facing an air outlet of the jet fan and a trailing edge of a diameter smaller than that of the leading edge but greater than that of the air outlet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 7/007; E21F 1/00; F04D 29/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/44 (2006.01); E21F 1/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01); F24F 7/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/007 (2013.01); E21F 1/003 (2013.01); F04D 29/545 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] FR 1601611 A 19700907
  • [Y] FR 1181456 A 19590616
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 09 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)
  • [Y] PAUL M. BEVILAQUA: "An Evaluation of Hypermixing for VSTOL Aircraft Augmentors", AIAA 6TH FLUID AND PLASMA DYNAMICS CONFERENCE, 16 July 1973 (1973-07-16) - 18 July 1973 (1973-07-18), Palm Springs, California, XP002127545

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0772007 A2 19970507; EP 0772007 A3 20000503; EP 0772007 B1 20040204; DE 69631459 D1 20040311; DE 69631459 T2 20040624; JP 3575891 B2 20041013; JP H09126194 A 19970513; KR 0174803 B1 19990320; TW 397888 B 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071026

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071026

2006-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-09-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69631459

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ECOLOGY SYSTEMS CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021031

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24F 7/007 A, 7E 21F 1/00 B, 7F 04D 29/54 B

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961026

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB