Global patent index - EP 0772019 B1

EP 0772019 B1 2000-08-30 - Heat exchanger having tubes of oval or oblong cross section and method of assembling the same

Title (en)

Heat exchanger having tubes of oval or oblong cross section and method of assembling the same

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit Rohren mit ovalem oder länglichem Querschnitt und Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à tubes de section ovale ou oblongue et son procédé d'assemblage

Publication

EP 0772019 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96117254 A

Priority

FR 9512949 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0772019A1] The heat exchanger consists of a series of oval-section tubes (12) with fins (14) and ends which pass through apertures in collector plates (20) with compressible seals (30) forming collars (34) round the ends of the tubes. The longer axis of each tube oval cross-section is the same along the whole of the tube, while the shorter axis is greater at the end of the tube, caused by an expansion of the tube as it passes through the collector plate aperture and seal. The expansion is produced by a tool (48) with a shaped tip (50) which is driven into the end of each tube after it has been assembled with the collector plate, compressing the seal against the sides of the aperture. The compression of the seal in a lengthwise direction is carried out before the tubes are fitted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/165 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49375 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49378 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49391 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0772019 A1 19970507; EP 0772019 B1 20000830; BR 9605375 A 19980728; DE 69610059 D1 20001005; DE 69610059 T2 20010412; FR 2740869 A1 19970509; FR 2740869 B1 19971219; MX 9605319 A 19970830; US 5901784 A 19990511; US 6044554 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061009

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-05

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-02-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING TUBES OF OVAL OR OBLONG CROSS SECTION AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING THE SAME

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971027

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT