Global patent index - EP 0772085 B1

EP 0772085 B1 2000-01-26 - Bleach regenerator composition and its use to process reversal color photographic elements

Title (en)

Bleach regenerator composition and its use to process reversal color photographic elements

Title (de)

Bleich-Auffrischerzusammensetzung und deren Verwendung zur Behandlung von farbfotografischen Umkehrelementen

Title (fr)

Composition régénénatrice de blanchiment et son utilisation pour le traitement d'éléments photographiques couleur inversibles

Publication

EP 0772085 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202980 A

Priority

  • US 815995 P
  • US 58803396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0772085A2] A ferric-EDTA bleach regenerator composition can be mixed with bleach overflow to provide a bleach replenisher for reversal color silver halide photographic processes. The bleach regenerator composition has a critically controlled pH between 6.0 and 6.5, and comprises a total bromide ion concentration of at least 210 g/l, and ferric ion in an amount of at least 50 g/l. At least 50% of the bleach overflow and the bleach regenerator composition are mixed in at least a 1:1 volume ratio. After pH adjustment to from 5.4 to 5.6, the pH adjusted replenisher is supplied to the bleach tank for use in the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/50 (2006.01); G03C 7/00 (2006.01); G03C 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/44 (2013.01); G03C 5/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0772085 A2 19970507; EP 0772085 A3 19970521; EP 0772085 B1 20000126; DE 69606377 D1 20000302; DE 69606377 T2 20000824; JP H09166855 A 19970624

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041025

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041025

2003-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606377

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980217

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971022

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB