Global patent index - EP 0772215 B1

EP 0772215 B1 2000-07-19 - Isolating switch, in particular load break isolating switch assembly for medium voltage

Title (en)

Isolating switch, in particular load break isolating switch assembly for medium voltage

Title (de)

Trennschalter, insbesondere Mittelspannungs-Lasttrennschalter

Title (fr)

Sectionneur, en particulier disjoncteur sectionneur pour moyenne tension

Publication

EP 0772215 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116928 A

Priority

DE 19540552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0772215A1] The disconnecting or insulating switch has support insulators (4). An insulating contact is arranged at each terminal of the insulator (4). The switch has a movable contact blade, a lag contact and a closed explosion chamber (10) with a movable switch pin. The chamber (10) is preferably filled with SF6 gas. The switch has a support insulator (4) with an integral explosion chamber (10) per terminal. The explosion chambers (10) are preferably disposed between the support insulators (3,4) of a terminal. The chamber (10) may be integrated in the support insulator at which the pivot point of the contact blade is disposed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/126 (2013.01); H01H 33/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0772215 A1 19970507; EP 0772215 B1 20000719; AT 194879 T 20000815; DE 19540552 A1 19970507; NO 964375 A 19970502; NO 964375 D0 19961015

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRITZ DRIESCHER K.G. SPEZIALFABRIK FUR ELEKTRIZIT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001022

2000-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605621

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES LI NL SE

2000-07-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194879

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990113

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970426

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES LI NL SE