Global Patent Index - EP 0772253 B1

EP 0772253 B1 2000-06-28 - Angled connector

Title (en)

Angled connector

Title (de)

Winkelverbindungselement

Title (fr)

Connecteur angulaire

Publication

EP 0772253 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116723 A

Priority

DE 19540614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0772253A1] The connecting element has a connection part (9) such as micro-stripline, Tri-plate line or coplanar line, on the planar structure (14) side which can be brought into contact with at least one planar conducting path (15). A connecting part (4) on the coaxial structure side is arranged at an angle to the first connection part and is connected to a coaxial cable. The connection part on the planar structure side is a planar waveguide which is connected to the connection part on the coaxial structure side inside the outer periphery of the angled connection element. The planar structure element is mounted at right angles to the planar structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/08; H01R 9/05; H01R 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/08 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01P 5/08 (2013.01); H01R 9/0515 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01); H01R 2201/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0772253 A1 19970507; EP 0772253 B1 20000628; AT 194252 T 20000715; DE 19540614 A1 19970507; DE 19540614 C2 19990527; DK 0772253 T3 20001106; ES 2148653 T3 20001016; PT 772253 E 20001229; US 5853295 A 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161024

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161017

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161016

2017-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170126

2016-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 194252 T

- Effective date: 20161017

2016-11-30 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-11-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161016

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-24 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20161017

2016-10-19 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161016

2016-10-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605493

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20151006

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151002

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148653 T3

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605493 20000803

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19961108

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194252 T 20000715

2000-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01P 5/08 A, 7H 01R 9/05 B, 7H 01R 11/12 B

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980925

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970528

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1997-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 961108