Global patent index - EP 0772260 B1

EP 0772260 B1 2000-01-05 - Electrical monolithic connector and method for making it

Title (en)

Electrical monolithic connector and method for making it

Title (de)

Elektrischer monolithischer Verbinder und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique monolithique et procédé pour sa réalisation

Publication

EP 0772260 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402328 A

Priority

FR 9513240 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0772260A1] The connector is a series of circularly curved sections (10,11) forming a winding. The section is connected (6) at one end to a cable and at the other end to the connector (2) to the airbag actuator for instance. The coil winding is formed by cutting and bending an electrical flat foil to a curved section. The curved sections form a self inductance section and contact spring. The structure is formed from a single flat plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/719 (2011.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6633 (2013.01); H01R 13/719 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0772260 A1 19970507; EP 0772260 B1 20000105; DE 69606010 D1 20000210; DE 69606010 T2 20000608; ES 2140807 T3 20000301; FR 2740915 A1 19970509; FR 2740915 B1 19971205; PT 772260 E 20000630

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20041102

2005-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-05-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2004-11-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041102

2004-06-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031014

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-10-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-10-01 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021025

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2140807

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606010

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

1999-12-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PATRITO BREVETTI

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1997-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPAGNIE FRANCAISE DE CABLAGE

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970623

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT