Global Patent Index - EP 0772261 B1

EP 0772261 B1 2000-08-16 - Coaxial connector

Title (en)

Coaxial connector

Title (de)

Koaxial-Steckverbindung

Title (fr)

Connecteur coaxial

Publication

EP 0772261 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115922 A

Priority

DE 29517358 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09167656A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To keep well known impedance and make miniaturization possible by making the front part of an outside sleeve in a pin part thin. SOLUTION: An outside sleeve 15 of a pin part 14 has a thin sleeve 18 capable of inserting into a bushing part 1 in the front. An elastic locking hook 19 bent from the thin sleeve 18 is projected outward through an opening 24 of an unlocking sleeve 23 capable of moving in the length direction along the outside sleeve 15 and the thin sleeve 18, and the unlocking sleeve 23 is pressed frontward with a front inclined surface 20. The inner edge 13 of a closed sleeve 12 pushed in an outside sleeve 2 of the bushing part 1 forms a stopper for a pressure applying sleeve 9 having a step part, and a locking shoulder for the locking hook 19 in the pin part 14. When a plug-in connector is bound, the whole outer dimension can be kept small by the thin sleeve 18 of the pin part 14.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646; H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/40 (2013.01); H01R 13/6277 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29517358 U1 19960111; EP 0772261 A2 19970507; EP 0772261 A3 19980506; EP 0772261 B1 20000816; JP 2888334 B2 19990510; JP H09167656 A 19970624; US 5746619 A 19980505

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051004

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041004

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041004

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031006

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605755 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/646 A, 7H 01R 13/627 B

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980914

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980519

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING KGAA

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE