Global Patent Index - EP 0772695 B1

EP 0772695 B1 2000-02-09 - GAS FLUSHING DEVICE IN THE BLOWPIPE OF A VACUUM DEGASSING VESSEL

Title (en)

GAS FLUSHING DEVICE IN THE BLOWPIPE OF A VACUUM DEGASSING VESSEL

Title (de)

GASSPÜLEINRICHTUNG IM RÜSSEL EINES VAKUUM-ENTGASUNGSGEFÄSSES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RIN AGE PAR GAZ MONTE DANS LE TUYAU DE SOUFFLAGE D'UNE CUVE DE DEGAZAGE SOUS VIDE

Publication

EP 0772695 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95928468 A

Priority

  • DE 4426368 A
  • DE 29512335 U
  • EP 9502956 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9603530A1] The invention concerns a gas flushing device for a blowpipe (10, 12) of a degassing vessel, the blowpipe being cladded with a fire-resistant material. The proposed gas flushing device has a plurality of channels (20, 22) which are distributed around the circumference of the blowpipe (10, 12) and pass through the fire-resistant cladding (14) radially in relation to the central longitudinal axis (M) of the blowpipe (10, 12) and can be connected on the outside to at least one gas feed pipe. The channels (20, 22) (a) are between 0.5 and 2 mm in diameter; (b) are spaced at intervals of less than 10 cm; (c) can be pressurized with gas in such a way that the gas on entering the blowpipe (10, 12) rises in the immediate vicinity of the blowpipe inner wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2006.01); C21C 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/10 (2013.01); B22D 1/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9603530 A1 19960208; AU 3221895 A 19960222; EP 0772695 A1 19970514; EP 0772695 B1 20000209; ES 2143647 T3 20000516; US 5853658 A 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-07-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020727

2002-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143647 T3

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VEITSCH-RADEX GMBH

1997-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971107

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970123

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT