Global patent index - EP 0772703 B1

EP 0772703 B1 2000-01-05 - SELVAGE-FORMING DEVICE FOR A MECHANICAL LOOM

Title (en)

SELVAGE-FORMING DEVICE FOR A MECHANICAL LOOM

Title (de)

KANTENEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION DE LISIERES POUR METIER A TISSER

Publication

EP 0772703 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95932777 A

Priority

  • BE 9500474 A
  • EP 9503704 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5803133A] PCT No. PCT/EP95/03704 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 28, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 28, 1997 PCT Filed Sep. 20, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/38608 PCT Pub. Date Dec. 5, 1996A power loom selvage forming device includes at least two thread guide elements for guiding selvage threads. The thread guide elements are guided in longitudinal guides and are connected by transmission elements to a drive shaft driven by a drive motor. The axis of the drive shaft is perpendicular to the direction of motion of the thread guide elements, with the transmission element converting the rotations of the drive motor into longitudinal motions of the thread guide elements containing at least one element mounted on the drive shaft and including articulation points eccentric to the drive shaft and at a mutual angular separation. The drive motor is rotatable by a control into predetermined angular positions at predetermined times.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/40 (2006.01); D03C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 5803133 A 19980908; BE 1009375 A6 19970204; CN 1043258 C 19990505; CN 1155911 A 19970730; DE 59507582 D1 20000210; EP 0772703 A1 19970514; EP 0772703 B1 20000105; ES 2141382 T3 20000316; HK 1000895 A1 20001013; JP 4017041 B2 20071205; JP H10503563 A 19980331; WO 9638608 A1 19961205

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140921

2015-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20151028

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140920

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59507582

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59507582

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: PICANOL, BE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: PICANOL N.V., IEPER, BE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507582

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110920

2012-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507582

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110920

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

- Free Format Text: PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE) -TRANSFER TO- PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE)

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2141382

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-03-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507582

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO G. PETSCHNER

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980826

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970114

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT