Global Patent Index - EP 0772953 A4

EP 0772953 A4 2002-11-13 - PIEZO SPEAKER AND INSTALLATION METHOD FOR LAPTOP PERSONAL COMPUTER AND OTHER MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

PIEZO SPEAKER AND INSTALLATION METHOD FOR LAPTOP PERSONAL COMPUTER AND OTHER MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

PIEZOLAUTSPRECHER UND EINBAUVERFAHREN FÜR TRAGBAREN PERSONALCOMPUTER UND ANDERE MULTIMEDIAANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

HAUT-PARLEUR PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE ET SON PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION POUR ORDINATEUR PERSONNEL PORTATIF ET AUTRES APPLICATIONS MULTIMEDIA

Publication

EP 0772953 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95924733 A

Priority

  • US 26721894 A
  • US 9508131 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9601547A2] This application outlines several applications of a piezoelectric materials invention to produce quality loudspeakers in applications where coil driven dynamic speakers are difficult or impossible to implement with an appreciable degree of sound quality. This invention includes a series of modifications to a laptop computer such as the IBM 750c. The modifications to the computer consist of placing piezoelectric patches behind the LCD and directly to the back wall of the laptop lid. Damping materials and stiffeners are also added to the back wall to reduce structural resonance. A system consisting of an audio amplifier and transformer is used to drive the piezo speaker.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 17/00; G05B 23/02; G06F 1/16; H04R 3/00; H04R 17/02; H04R 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/16 (2006.01); H04R 17/00 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/1616 (2013.01); G06F 1/1632 (2013.01); G06F 1/1688 (2013.01); H04R 17/00 (2013.01); H04R 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9601547 A2 19960118; WO 9601547 A3 19960222; CA 2194266 A1 19960118; CA 2194266 C 20010403; EP 0772953 A2 19970514; EP 0772953 A4 20021113; US 5638456 A 19970610

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080103

2008-02-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1007410

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

2003-02-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEW TRANSDUCERS LIMITED

2002-11-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020927

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NCT GROUP, INC.

2001-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04R 17/00 A, 7H 04R 17/02 B, 7H 04R 17/06 B, 7H 04R 3/00 B, 7G 05B 23/02 B, 7G 06F 1/16 B

1997-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CONLEY, JOHN, K.

1997-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOKONASKI, WILLIAM

1997-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARRELLA, MICHAEL, J.

1997-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MACHACEK, STEVEN, L.

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970206

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE