Global Patent Index - EP 0772995 B1

EP 0772995 B1 2001-05-23 - Dishwashing machine with differenced washing capability

Title (en)

Dishwashing machine with differenced washing capability

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit veränderlicher Spüllfähigkeit

Title (fr)

Machine à laver la vaisselle à capacité variable de lavage

Publication

EP 0772995 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96117865 A

Priority

IT TO950908 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0772995A1] A dishwashing machine is described comprising an upper sprayer (6), a lower sprayer (4), a wash-liquid collecting sump (1), a washing pump (2), a supply circuit (5) to the upper sprayer (6), a supply circuit (3) to the lower sprayer (4) and an interception element (7') located downstream the pump (2) to exclude the supply circuit to one of the sprayers (4,6) if a washing cycle for a reduced crockery load is selected. According to the present invention an auxiliary hydraulic circuit (8) is provided between the pump delivery side (2) and the collecting sump (1), which is automatically inserted in case of a washing of a reduced load, and a setting element (9) located in said auxiliary circuit (8) to reduce water consumption but letting the pump (2) operate in a favourable work point and limiting the pressure on the interception element (7'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/23; A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4221 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0772995 A1 19970514; EP 0772995 B1 20010523; DE 69612941 D1 20010628; DE 69612941 T2 20010913; ES 2158212 T3 20010901; IT 1280477 B1 19980120; IT TO950908 A1 19970512; IT TO950908 D0 19951110

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131107

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101108

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158212 T3

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612941 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990611

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB