Global patent index - EP 0773045 B1

EP 0773045 B1 2000-05-17 - Ball casing,in particular for soccer balls

Title (en)

Ball casing,in particular for soccer balls

Title (de)

Ballhülle, insbesondere für Fussbälle

Title (fr)

Enveloppe pour ballons, en particulier ballons de football

Publication

EP 0773045 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111584 A

Priority

DE 19541395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773045A2] The football cover has a number of flat sections which are sewn together along their mating edges, so that the surface of the ball has a pattern provided by a group of 5-sided surfaces (12) and a group of 6-sided surfaces, or 3-armed star surfaces (31). Each 5-sided surface is enclosed by a 6-sided surface or a 3-armed star surface on each of its 5 sides, with a number of 6-sided surfaces or 3-sided star surfaces combined as a single cut-out. The 5-sides surfaces are formed by individual cut-out blanks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 41/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 41/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 41/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773045 A2 19970514; EP 0773045 A3 19980107; EP 0773045 B1 20000517; DE 19541395 A1 19970515; DE 19541395 C2 19980122; JP H09131420 A 19970520; US 5709623 A 19980120

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090804

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080718

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080718

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BALL CASING,IN PARTICULAR FOR SOCCER BALLS

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990223

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980302

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT