Global patent index - EP 0773074 B1

EP 0773074 B1 2000-01-26 - Horizontal strip-accumulator

Title (en)

Horizontal strip-accumulator

Title (de)

Horizontaler Bandspeicher

Title (fr)

Accumulateur de bandes horizontal

Publication

EP 0773074 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117373 A

Priority

DE 19542184 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773074A1] The horizontal store has a frame (2) supporting a loop carriage (11) at a variable spacing from a stationary deflection roller (10) for the metal band (1), fitted with at least one deflection roller (12-14) for providing a variable length storage loop (3) and support carriages (19) for support rollers (15-18). A flexible drive element (6) coupled to the loop carriage passes around a drive wheel (20) for each support carriage, with a second drive element (7) extending along the frame adjacent the path of the support carriages, cooperating with a second drive wheel in cinematic engagement with the first drive wheel of each support carriage via an intermediate gearing (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 49/00 (2006.01); B65H 20/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 49/00 (2013.01); B65H 20/34 (2013.01); B65H 2403/21 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2171 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773074 A1 19970514; EP 0773074 B1 20000126; AT 189141 T 20000215; CA 2189826 A1 19970514; CA 2189826 C 20041012; CN 1082854 C 20020417; CN 1158765 A 19970910; DE 19542184 A1 19970515; ES 2142535 T3 20000416; JP 3881073 B2 20070214; JP H09164427 A 19970624; RU 2182857 C2 20020527; TW 314481 B 19970901; US 5769302 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071030

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071030

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG A.G. *SMS

- Effective date: 20071031

2006-11-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-05-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142535

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189141

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990312

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961113

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE