Global patent index - EP 0773076 B1

EP 0773076 B1 2000-04-05 - Apparatus for controlling the pressure in hydraulic cushion devices of presses

Title (en)

Apparatus for controlling the pressure in hydraulic cushion devices of presses

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Steuerung und Regelung des Druckes in hydraulischen Ziehkissen von Pressen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de la pression dans des serre-flans hydrauliques des presses à emboutir

Publication

EP 0773076 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117676 A

Priority

DE 19541693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773076A1] The device has a cushion plate (8) guided in the press table (6) which interacts via a pressure bolt (7) with the sheet holder (4) and also interacts with a controllable central cylinder and at least one draw cushion cylinder (11), or the cylinder's piston rod directly interacts with sheet holder. The oil in the cylinder chamber communicates with a biassed tank (130) via a line (28). A proportional valve in the line is subjected to a counter pressure compensated by mass forces acting on the piston. The line (28) between the cylinder chamber and valve (12) is connected to the tank (13) so that a non-return valve (18), a controlled switching valve (19), a pressure source (20), further non-return valve (21) and pump are connected in series. The piston rod is limited by a fixed or adjustable stop (29) and the proportional valve is controlled by a force regulator (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 24/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 24/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 24/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773076 A1 19970514; EP 0773076 B1 20000405; DE 19541693 A1 19970515; ES 2145362 T3 20000701

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604877

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091106

2011-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081106

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-04-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145362

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604877

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971203

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE