Global Patent Index - EP 0773084 B1

EP 0773084 B1 2002-09-18 - Sawing tool, in particular saw chain

Title (en)

Sawing tool, in particular saw chain

Title (de)

Säge, insbesondere Kettensäge

Title (fr)

Outil de sciage, en particulier chaîne de sciage

Publication

EP 0773084 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101210 A

Priority

  • DE 4237781 A
  • EP 93118157 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4237781A1] The object of the invention is a chain for chain saws with a plurality of coupled chain links bearing cutters and pivotable in relation to one another in a common running plane. According to the invention, to facilitate the exchange of deteriorated individual components and to simplify the chain guidance and the chain drive, the individual components are put together directly in a rigid assembly transversely to the common running plane with the inter-engagement of adjacent individual components along side surfces perpendicular to the common running plane. In a preferred embodiment each individual component (A, B) has an at least three-layer structure with an internal core section (K) and two side sections (S, S'), where each core section (K) has a downwardly curved projection (1) starting from its leading edge in the forward direction of the chain and a hook (2) projecting downwards and forwards from its rear edge in the forward direction of the chain and an upper and rear recess (3) matching the projection (1) to take the projection (1) of the next core section (K) and a lower forward recess (4) terminating in a pivot pin (5) for engaging with the hook (2) of the leading core section (K). In addition, as cutting components on the chain components (A, B), there may be at least two kinds of teeth with different cutting edges which are fitted alternately along the line of the chain, where preferably the teeth of one kind are cutting teeth (9) and the others are raker teeth (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23D 61/12; B27B 33/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 33/145 (2013.01); B27B 33/14 (2013.01); Y10T 83/909 (2015.04); Y10T 83/913 (2015.04); Y10T 83/917 (2015.04); Y10T 83/925 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4237781 A1 19940511; DE 4237781 C2 19950810; AT 156057 T 19970815; AT 224252 T 20021015; BR 9305717 A 19961231; CA 2127708 A1 19940526; DK 0773084 T3 20030120; EP 0605770 A2 19940713; EP 0605770 A3 19940824; EP 0605770 B1 19970730; EP 0773084 A2 19970514; EP 0773084 A3 19980204; EP 0773084 B1 20020918; US 5988035 A 19991123; WO 9411166 A1 19940526

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051109

2006-07-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-12-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-07-12 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-12-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-01-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20021210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310303 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 605770

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224252 T 20021015

2002-09-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SAWING TOOL, IN PARTICULAR SAW CHAIN

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000113

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980804

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

1997-05-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 605770

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE