Global Patent Index - EP 0773112 B1

EP 0773112 B1 2001-05-30 - Heat sensitive imaging element and method for making a printing plate therewith

Title (en)

Heat sensitive imaging element and method for making a printing plate therewith

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungselement und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Druckform damit

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement thermosensible et méthode pour la fabrication d'un cliché pour l'imprimerie utilisant cet élément

Publication

EP 0773112 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202950 A

Priority

  • EP 96202950 A
  • EP 95203046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773112A1] The present invention discloses an imaging element comprising on a hydrophilic surface of a lithographic base an image forming layer comprising hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer particles dispersed in a hydrophilic binder and (ii) a compound capable of converting light to heat, said compound being comprised in said image forming layer or a layer adjacent thereto, characterised in that said image forming layer further comprises a cross-linking agent capable of cross-linking said hydrophilic binder upon heating in a ratio between 1 :100 and 200:1 by weight versus the hydrophilic binder. The present invention further provides a method for making a printing plate therewith. According to this method, the above imaging element is preferably exposed by means of a laser and is subsequently developed with plain water or an aqueous liquid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41M 5/366 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773112 A1 19970514; EP 0773112 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161021

2016-11-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161021

2016-10-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69613078

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150804

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69613078 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB