Global Patent Index - EP 0773113 B1

EP 0773113 B1 2000-05-24 - Heat sensitive imaging element and method for making a printing plate therewith

Title (en)

Heat sensitive imaging element and method for making a printing plate therewith

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungselement und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographischen Druckform damit

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement thermosensible et méthode pour la fabrication d'un cliché lithographique utilisant cet élément

Publication

EP 0773113 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202992 A

Priority

  • EP 96202992 A
  • EP 95203047 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773113A1] This invention provides a method for making a lithographic printing plate comprising the steps of: (1) image-wise exposing an imaging element comprising (i) on a hydrophilic surface of a lithographic base an image forming layer comprising hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer particles dispersed in a hydrophilic binder and (ii) a compound capable of converting light to heat, said compound being comprised in said image forming layer or a layer adjacent thereto; (2) developing a thus obtained image-wise exposed imaging element with plain water or an aqueous liquid; (3) and overall heating a thus obtained imaged imaging element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/366 (2013.01); B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

GB 2222388 A 19900307 - COOKSON GRAPHICS PLC [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773113 A1 19970514; EP 0773113 B1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608522

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608522 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB