Global patent index - EP 0773151 B1

EP 0773151 B1 2000-02-23 - Bogie for high speed railway vehicles

Title (en)

Bogie for high speed railway vehicles

Title (de)

Drehgestell für Hochgeschwindigkeits-Schienenfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Bogie pour véhicules ferroviaires à grande vitesse

Publication

EP 0773151 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116827 A

Priority

DE 19541393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773151A1] The chassis has a pair of wheel beams (7) extending parallel to the rails and coupled together via cross beams (20), each fitted with front and rear wheels at its ends. A cross member (4) is supported from the wheel beams via primary springs (5,6), with the rail vehicle carriage supported from the cross member via secondary springs (2,3). Coupling elements with transverse rigidity is provided between each of the wheel beams and the cross member, permitting vertical movement of the latter relative to the wheel beams.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 3/16; B61F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/16 (2006.01); B61F 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/16 (2013.01); B61F 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773151 A1 19970514; EP 0773151 B1 20000223; AT 189882 T 20000315; DE 19541393 A1 19970515; ES 2143121 T3 20000501

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20011113

2002-02-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-10-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143121

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604486

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI

2000-02-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189882

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS KRAUSS-MAFFEI LOKOMOTIVEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990113

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI