Global Patent Index - EP 0773171 B1

EP 0773171 B1 2000-03-22 - Container with swivelling sidewalls

Title (en)

Container with swivelling sidewalls

Title (de)

Behälter mit verschwenkbaren Seitenwänden

Title (fr)

Récipient à parois latérales pivotantes

Publication

EP 0773171 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118567 A

Priority

  • AT 228492 A
  • AT 9300166 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: AT401915B] The invention describes a container 1 having a base 2 and side-wall parts 3 to 6 which are connected thereto such that they can be pivoted from a position in which they are approximately perpendicular to the base 2 into a position in which they are in the same plane as the base 2. The side-wall parts 3 to 6 are connected to the base 2 via articulation arrangements 8 which are arranged in the region of the peripheral longitudinal-side and transverse- side surfaces 7. Furthermore, connecting devices 35 are arranged between the side-wall parts 3 to 6. These connecting devices 35 are arranged in the region of the end-side surfaces which bound the side-wall parts 3 to 6 in a manner corresponding to the longitudinal-side and transverse-side surfaces 7, and they are formed by a coupling device 38. Said coupling device 38 projects in the direction of an overlap region 31 of the further side- wall part 3 to 6 arranged at 90 degree, and has centring and/or locking elements 37. The centring and/or locking elements 37 are assigned, in the overlap region 31 of the further side-wall part 3 to 6, centring and/or locking mounts 39 which receive said centring and/or locking elements 37. The coupling device 38 comprises a latching arm 98 which projects into a coupling opening 46, is inclined at an angle 100 to an inner surface 90 of the adjacent side- wall part 3 to 6, is of elastically deformable design and causes a prestressing force which counteracts release of the coupling device 38. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 6/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/16 (2006.01); B65D 6/18 (2006.01); B65D 6/26 (2006.01); B65D 19/12 (2006.01); B65D 88/52 (2006.01); B65D 90/08 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B65D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 11/1833 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5357 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53605 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5361 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53615 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9308051 U1 19930805; AT 150719 T 19970415; AT 190941 T 20000415; AT 401765 B 19961125; AT 401915 B 19961227; AT A183495 A 19960515; AT A228492 A 19960415; AU 1899297 A 19970619; AU 5411694 A 19940608; AU 679194 B2 19970626; AU 709267 B2 19990826; BG 99717 A 19960131; BR 9307476 A 19990601; CA 2149668 A1 19940526; CH 686776 A5 19960628; CZ 9501261 A3 19951115; DE 4395690 D2 19960111; DE 59305986 D1 19970430; DE 59309990 D1 20000427; DK 0668833 T3 19971013; DK 0773171 T3 20001113; EP 0668833 A1 19950830; EP 0668833 B1 19970326; EP 0773171 A2 19970514; EP 0773171 A3 19970618; EP 0773171 B1 20000322; ES 2101355 T3 19970701; ES 2147338 T3 20000901; FI 952362 A0 19950515; FI 952362 A 19950515; FI 981569 A0 19931029; FI 981569 A 19980708; GR 1001857 B 19950405; GR 3033735 T3 20001031; GR 930100450 A 19940729; HU 218548 B 20001028; HU 218880 B 20001228; HU 9501279 D0 19950628; HU 9801567 D0 19980928; HU T71372 A 19951128; IL 107621 A 19961016; IL 107621 D0 19940227; IT 230618 Y1 19990609; IT MI930633 U1 19940518; IT MI930633 V0 19930728; JP 3023175 B2 20000321; JP H08502940 A 19960402; NO 951930 A 19950516; NO 951930 D0 19950516; PL 304680 A1 19950109; PT 773171 E 20000929; RU 2108275 C1 19980410; RU 95113432 A 19970320; SK 66495 A3 19960508; US 5588549 A 19961231; US 5706555 A 19980113; WO 9411259 A1 19940526

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-01-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140115

2013-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 190941 T

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121009

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061029

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061029

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060205

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEINER TECHNOLOGY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-08-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-08-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-06-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-03-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-10-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20001031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-10-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20001013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20000929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-09-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20000921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000911

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-08 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20000908

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147338 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABP PATENTMARKETING GMBH

2000-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59309990 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 668833

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190941 T 20000415

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINER TECHNOLOGY GMBH

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981119

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961120

1997-05-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 668833

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE