Global Patent Index - EP 0773179 B1

EP 0773179 B1 2001-05-30 - Device for making auxiliary stacks during continuous pile exchange in a piler of a printing machine

Title (en)

Device for making auxiliary stacks during continuous pile exchange in a piler of a printing machine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Hilfsstapelbildung beim Nonstopstapelwechsel im Ausleger einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faire des piles auxiliaires pendant l'échange en continue de piles dans un empileur d'une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0773179 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117493 A

Priority

DE 19541792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773179A2] An arrangement for the non-stop changing of stacks in the curved arm of a printing machine, comprises a stack carrier which can be pushed in the advancing direction between two separate sections, and a separating unit which supports the upper section until the carrier (4) reaches its insertion position. A holding unit (3) prevents the upper section from moving due to the carrier. The separating unit is preferably consists of a flexible band, especially a steel band coated with PTFE.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 31/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/32 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42622 (2013.01); B65H 2701/176 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773179 A2 19970514; EP 0773179 A3 19971001; EP 0773179 B1 20010530; DE 19541792 A1 19970515; DE 19541792 B4 20040930; JP 3816997 B2 20060830; JP H09169465 A 19970630; US 5915688 A 19990629

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606994

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606994 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991220

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961031

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB