Global Patent Index - EP 0773180 B1

EP 0773180 B1 2001-04-18 - Method and device for increasing safety of elevators

Title (en)

Method and device for increasing safety of elevators

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur erhöhten Sicherheit bei Aufzügen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour augmenter la sécurité des ascenseurs

Publication

EP 0773180 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117251 A

Priority

CH 315895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773180A1] The method derives a desired motion characteristic in a controller and passing it with motion parameters to a drive controller. If a safety limit is exceeded, the lift cabin is stopped. The same motion parameters are passed to a second controller for a reference drive so that a triggering part moved by the reference drive has the same motion characteristic. The triggering part is movably connected to the lift cabin so that a switch for stopping the cabin is triggered by the triggering part if the deviation of the lift cabin from the motion characteristic is greater than the safety limit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/32 (2006.01); B66B 1/30 (2006.01); B66B 5/04 (2006.01); B66B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773180 A1 19970514; EP 0773180 B1 20010418; AT 200657 T 20010515; DE 59606797 D1 20010523; HK 1012323 A1 20011102; JP 4071839 B2 20080402; JP H09165156 A 19970624; MY 118747 A 20050131; US 5869794 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606797

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131028

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-01-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606797 20010523

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200657 T 20010515

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000210

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971020

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI