Global Patent Index - EP 0773317 B1

EP 0773317 B1 2001-01-10 - Device and machine for the mechanical treatment of high consistency pulp

Title (en)

Device and machine for the mechanical treatment of high consistency pulp

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Behandlungsmaschine zur mechanischen Behandlung von hochkonsistentem Faserstoff

Title (fr)

Dispositif et machine pour le traitement mécanique de pulpe à consistence élevée

Publication

EP 0773317 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115699 A

Priority

DE 19541892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19541892C1] Highly consolidated fibrous material is treated mechanically by the relative motion of tools (1,2) mounted on coaxial bodies with rotational symmetry. Teeth (3,3',4,4') are fitted in concentric rings with gaps (5,6) to give a clear cross- section for material flow. The teeth of one tool move through a ring shaped space between the rows of teeth on the other tool. The gaps (5,6) between adjacent teeth are of different lengths (L,L1,L',L1').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 1/30; B01F 7/00; B02C 7/12; B02C 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/12 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B02C 7/12 (2006.01); B02C 13/22 (2006.01); D21D 1/30 (2006.01); B01F 3/12 (2006.01); B01F 3/14 (2006.01); B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00758 (2013.01); B02C 7/12 (2013.01); B02C 13/22 (2013.01); D21D 1/008 (2013.01); D21D 1/30 (2013.01); B01F 3/14 (2013.01); B01F 7/02 (2013.01); B01F 2003/125 (2013.01); B01F 2005/0011 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0078 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B01F 7/02 + B01F 7/00766

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19541892 C1 19961121; AT 198633 T 20010115; BR 9605489 A 19980811; CA 2189902 A1 19970511; EP 0773317 A1 19970514; EP 0773317 B1 20010110; JP H09170184 A 19970630; NO 308221 B1 20000814; NO 964739 A 19970512; NO 964739 D0 19961108; US 5727743 A 19980317

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041002

2004-10-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-11-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606304 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198633 T 20010115

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR SE