Global Patent Index - EP 0773347 B1

EP 0773347 B1 2000-05-31 - Strip seal for turbomachinery rotor blade tips

Title (en)

Strip seal for turbomachinery rotor blade tips

Title (de)

Lamellendichtung für Turbotriebwerke im Bereich der Rotorschaufelspitzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité à lamelles pour des extremités des aubes mobiles de turbomachine

Publication

EP 0773347 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116641 A

Priority

DE 19542083 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773347A1] A turbine engine seal, for the rotor blade tip region, has a cover band ring on the blade tips and opposite stationary casing ring segments in the cowling for sealing the rotor-stator gap. The novelty is that the cover band ring (5) has a smooth radially outer surface (9) and is held radially displaceably by the blades (11), while elastic laminates (12) extend radially inwards from the stationary casing ring segments of the cowling (20) to form scraping faces. The out-of-roundness tolerance and roughness of the radially outer cover band ring surface (9), the elasticity of the laminates (12) and the size of the scraping face of each laminate (12) are mutually related such that, beyond a critical relative speed between the radially outer cover band ring surface (9) and the scraping faces, an aerodynamic smoothing of scraping faces occurs on the outer surface of the cover band ring (5). Pref. the cover band ring (5) is a closed self-supporting ring of fibre-reinforced material, pre f. of SiC, B or C fibres in a metallic or ceramic matrix.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/02; F01D 5/22; F01D 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/22 (2006.01); F01D 11/08 (2006.01); F01D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/12 (2013.01); F01D 5/225 (2013.01); F01D 11/08 (2013.01); F05D 2240/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19542083 C1 19970109; AT 193584 T 20000615; EP 0773347 A1 19970514; EP 0773347 B1 20000531; ES 2148652 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101018

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101017

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101017

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101017

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101017

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091015

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148652

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193584

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990723

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970326

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT