Global Patent Index - EP 0773351 B1

EP 0773351 B1 2001-03-21 - Method for producing a cylinder head unit having valve seats and a valve seat member

Title (en)

Method for producing a cylinder head unit having valve seats and a valve seat member

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Zylinderkopfes mit zwei unterschiedlichen Ventilsitzen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une culasse avec des composants formant siège-soupape

Publication

EP 0773351 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96114721 A

Priority

JP 23726495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773351A1] A method is provided for producing a cylinder head unit of an internal combustion engine. Said cylinder head unit comprising a cylinder head body, an air intake system communicating with a combustion chamber at an at least one intake port opening, an exhaust system communicating with the combustion chamber at an at least one exhaust port opening. The intake and exhaust port openings are each operable by respective intake and exhaust valves guided by respective valve guides accommodated in respective valve guide holes, whereby a valve seat made of a material different from that of the cylinder head body is bonded to each of the respective intake and exhaust port openings. Each valve seat is provided by metallurgically bonding a respective valve seat member onto a valve seat seating surface of the respective intake and exhaust port openings. An annular projection consisting of two surfaces and projecting from the inner circumferential side of the valve seat seating surface of the respective opening is formed. Further, the valve seat member has an outer circumferential surface sloping towards its center and a bottom surface continuing from the outer circumferential surface and sloping with a smaller gradient than that of the outer circumferential surface towards the center of said openings. Said bottom surface is in line-contact with said projection when said valve seat member is set onto said respective valve seat seating surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/22 (2006.01); F01L 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773351 A1 19970514; EP 0773351 B1 20010321; DE 69612167 D1 20010426; DE 69612167 T2 20010719; JP H0979012 A 19970325

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050913

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050913

2004-09-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040908

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040908

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612167

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000426

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970730

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB