Global patent index - EP 0773424 B1

EP 0773424 B1 2000-09-20 - Projectile forming charge improved in withstanding acceleration

Title (en)

Projectile forming charge improved in withstanding acceleration

Title (de)

Hohlladungsgefechtskopf mit verbesserter Beschleunigungsfestigkeit

Title (fr)

Charge génératrice de noyau ayant une tenue à l'accélération améliorée

Publication

EP 0773424 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402311 A

Priority

FR 9513378 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773424A1] The explosive charge cover (4), especially for a sub-munition ejected from a carrier shell, is fitted onto a support (5) with a cylindrical projection (5a) adjusted to the inner diameter of the charge casing, the support being fixed to the casing by connectors which ensure its axial retention. The support (5) is ring-shaped, conical or in the form of a dome applied to the explosive charge (3) and made with a recess to receive the cover, the cover being made from tantalum and the dome of aluminium alloy. Where the support is in the form of a ring it can have concentric flexible tongues.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 1/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/028 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773424 A1 19970514; EP 0773424 B1 20000920; DE 69610395 D1 20001026; DE 69610395 T2 20010308; FR 2741142 A1 19970516; FR 2741142 B1 19980102

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051030

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2004-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610395

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-26

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KERDRAON, ALAIN

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VIVES, MICHEL

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990305

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970611

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE