Global Patent Index - EP 0773425 B1

EP 0773425 B1 2000-05-17 - Means for lining retention for a hollow charge

Title (en)

Means for lining retention for a hollow charge

Title (de)

Auskleidungsbefestigungsmittel für eine Hohlladung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien d'un revêtement d'une charge génératrice de noyau

Publication

EP 0773425 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402313 A

Priority

FR 9513379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773425A1] The holder (12) for an explosive charge cover (11) which is designed to form the nose cone of a projectile when detonated consists of a wedging member in the form of a ring or annular support (12) which holds the cover in place axially in relation to the charge casing (10) until it is separated from the carrier shell (1) during the latter's trajectory.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 1/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/028 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773425 A1 19970514; EP 0773425 B1 20000517; DE 69608392 D1 20000621; DE 69608392 T2 20000921; FR 2741143 A1 19970516; FR 2741143 B1 19980102

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608392

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-06-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608392 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990310

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970611

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE