Global Patent Index - EP 0773566 B1

EP 0773566 B1 2000-02-16 - Electric apparatus with movable contacts mounted on a contact support

Title (en)

Electric apparatus with movable contacts mounted on a contact support

Title (de)

Elektrisches Gerät mit auf einen Kontaktträger montierten beweglichen Kontakten

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique à contact(s) mobile(s) monté(s) rotatif(s) sur un support de contact(s)

Publication

EP 0773566 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402342 A

Priority

FR 9513192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773566A1] The switch block includes the moving contact (13A) which is formed with two elbows making two sections (36,38) by which it rotates around the cross-piece (25A). The second elbow (39) is in the opposite direction to the first (37) and the first is more open than the second while both form angles (A,B) slightly less than 90 degrees . The moving contact pivots lie between two flat side pieces (26) of the support (12) which are connected by the cross-piece. The abutment (29) is cut into at least one of the side pieces and forms a hook preceded by an oblique slope (30). The abutment holds the middle part (34) of the moving contact against the spring (28) when the switch is open.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773566 A1 19970514; EP 0773566 B1 20000216; AT 189850 T 20000315; DE 69606683 D1 20000323; DE 69606683 T2 20000608; ES 2142032 T3 20000401; FR 2740901 A1 19970509; FR 2740901 B1 19980130

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061105

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061105

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061105

2005-12-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051104

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142032 T3

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606683 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189850 T 20000315

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990319

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970613

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT