Global Patent Index - EP 0773570 B1

EP 0773570 B1 2000-12-20 - Electrical device with opening and closing contacts to be coupled to an electrical apparatus with a movable element

Title (en)

Electrical device with opening and closing contacts to be coupled to an electrical apparatus with a movable element

Title (de)

Elektrische Vorrichtung mit Öffnungs- und Schliesskontakten zur Kupplung an ein elektrisches Gerät mit einem Bewegungselement

Title (fr)

Dispositif électrique à contact à ouverture et fermeture destiné à être associé à un appareil électrique à élément mobile

Publication

EP 0773570 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402179 A

Priority

FR 9513184 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773570A1] The electrical device includes catches (2,2') which are clipped on and may be manually dismantled to ensure the matching of the device to the moving element when it is mounted on electrical equipment. One is dismantled while the other assures the mechanical link with the moving element. The slider is controlled by mechanical pulses after the dismantling. The casing (1), closed by a cover (1'), has a fixed hook (4') for fixing to the moving element which it carries. There is a moving hook (4) in a single piece, mounted and guided vertically in a sprung pushbutton (3). Moving contacts (6,6') make electrical contact under the force of springs (5,5'). The cover carries catches (7') which are forced into housings (7) in the casing to ensure the cover is fixed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54; H01H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/545 (2013.01); H01H 11/0006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773570 A1 19970514; EP 0773570 B1 20001220; AT 198244 T 20010115; DE 69611279 D1 20010125; DE 69611279 T2 20010426; ES 2153944 T3 20010316; FR 2740902 A1 19970509; FR 2740902 B1 19980130

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111015

2013-05-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130530

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111014

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69611279

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153944 T3

2001-03-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611279 20010125

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2000-12-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198244 T 20010115

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971011

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE