Global Patent Index - EP 0773612 B1

EP 0773612 B1 2001-01-03 - Device for the semi-automatic manufacturing of cable harnesses

Title (en)

Device for the semi-automatic manufacturing of cable harnesses

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur halbautomatischen Herstellung von Leitungssätzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication semi-automatique de faisceaux de câbles

Publication

EP 0773612 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117469 A

Priority

EP 95117469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0773612A1] The machine provides a facility for fitting contact elements onto various lengths of cable that make up a wiring loom. The system has a block magazine Ä1Ü, an article feed stage Ä2Ü, a contact station Ä3Ü and a test station Ä4Ü. The semi automatic machine has an operator for initiating specific functions. A feed unit is incorporated within the block magazine that displaces components . This has a slide element displaced by a roller drive. A proximity sensor indicates extraction of components

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0773612 A1 19970514; EP 0773612 B1 20010103; DE 59508942 D1 20010208

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051107

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-06-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031107

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STOCKO CONTACT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-01-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021106

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508942 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STOCKO CONTACT GMBH & CO. KG

1999-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR THE SEMI-AUTOMATIC MANUFACTURING OF CABLE HARNESSES

1998-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980326

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960918

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT