Global Patent Index - EP 0773630 A4

EP 0773630 A4 2000-11-08 - SOUND DECODING DEVICE

Title (en)

SOUND DECODING DEVICE

Title (de)

TONDEKODER

Title (fr)

DECODEUR DE SONS

Publication

EP 0773630 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96915190 A

Priority

  • JP 9601323 W
  • JP 12258595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6085158A] PCT No. PCT/JP96/01323 Sec. 371 Date Jan. 22, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Jan. 22, 1997 PCT Filed May 20, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO96/37964 PCT Pub. Date Nov. 28, 1996When errors occur in a received code sequence, an error concealment routine part 130 is actuated and a correct code sequence is generated based on a code sequence received before the errors are detected. A decoding routine part 21' executes a decoding process based on this code sequence and updates the internal state based on the decoded result. Thereafter, when the code errors are recovered, an error recovery routine part 140 is actuated. The error recovery routine part 140 re-estimates a correct code sequence during a time period when the errors are detected, based on a code sequence received before the errors are detected and a code sequence received after no more errors are detected, and generates a second estimated code sequence. The decode process part 21' executes the decoding process based on an internal state information for retaining the second estimated code sequence in an internal state storage part 23', and updates the internal state information based on the decoded result. By doing this, the quality of the decoded speech, which has recovered from code errors, can be improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03M 13/12; G10L 9/18; G10L 19/00; H04L 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/00 (2006.01); G11B 20/18 (2006.01); H03M 13/00 (2006.01); H04L 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/005 (2013.01); G11B 20/1806 (2013.01); H03M 13/00 (2013.01); H04L 1/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] C.R. WATKINS AND J.H. CHEN: "Improving 16 kb/s G.728 LD-CELP Speech Coder for Frame Erasure Channels", 1995 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. 1, 9 May 1995 (1995-05-09), New York, USA, pages 241 - 244, XP000657975
  • [A] J.H. CHEN ET AL.: "A Low-Delay CELP Coder for the CCITT 16 kb/s Speech Coding Standard", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 10, no. 5, June 1992 (1992-06-01), New York, USA, pages 830 - 849, XP000274718
  • See also references of WO 9637964A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6085158 A 20000704; CN 1100396 C 20030129; CN 1159260 A 19970910; DE 69633164 D1 20040923; DE 69633164 T2 20050811; EP 0773630 A1 19970514; EP 0773630 A4 20001108; EP 0773630 B1 20040818; JP 3155952 B2 20010416; WO 9637964 A1 19961128

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160519

2016-06-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160519

2016-05-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69633164

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150515

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69633164 P 20040923

2004-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/00 A

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 B

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/00 A

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 9/18 B

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/12 A

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 9/18 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/12 A

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 9/18 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/00 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/23 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/12 A

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 9/18 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/00 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/23 B

2003-11-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SOUND DECODING DEVICE

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 13/23 A

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 9/18 B

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 B

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/00 B

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-11-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 03M 13/12 A, 7G 10L 9/18 B, 7H 04L 1/00 B, 7G 10L 19/00 B

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970210

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE