Global Patent Index - EP 0773727 B1

EP 0773727 B1 2000-05-17 - DISPLAY SYSTEM

Title (en)

DISPLAY SYSTEM

Title (de)

WARENPRÄSENTATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PRESENTOIR

Publication

EP 0773727 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95929081 A

Priority

  • EP 9503105 W
  • GB 9415753 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2291788A] A display system comprising: a shelf member supportable in cantilever fashion from a vertical wall, and having either a rear portion adapted to be supported in cantilever fashion from a vertical wall, a forward portion adapted to be positioned in longitudinal engagement with the rear portion so as to increase the depth of the shelf member, and edge locking means adapted to secure edges of the rear portion and forward portion together in a load supporting cantilever arrangement, or mounting means integral with the shelf and extending length of the longitudinal edge of the shelf member of a part thereof, whereby the shelf member can be detachably supported in cantilever fashion from a vertical wall, or one or more undercut elongate channels, extending along the upper surface of the shelf member to receive cooperating projections on shelf dividers and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/02; A47F 1/12; A47F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/02 (2006.01); A47F 1/12 (2006.01); A47F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/025 (2013.01); A47F 1/126 (2013.01); A47F 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

GB 2291788 A 19960207; GB 2291788 B 19990113; GB 9415753 D0 19940928; AU 3257195 A 19960304; DE 69517031 D1 20000621; DE 69517031 T2 20001214; EP 0773727 A1 19970521; EP 0773727 B1 20000517; WO 9603902 A1 19960215

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69517031

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69517031

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517031 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980320

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970120

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR