Global Patent Index - EP 0773817 B1

EP 0773817 B1 2001-04-18 - SAFETY COLLARS

Title (en)

SAFETY COLLARS

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSKRAGEN

Title (fr)

COLLET DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 0773817 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95925912 A

Priority

  • GB 9501697 W
  • GB 9415573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2291780A] A safety collar 10 has two air bags 13 and 15 for fitting at the sides of the neck to prevent over-tilting of the head. The bags are somewhat separated from an upright neck and are arranged to rest on the shoulders of the wearer. In use, the safety collar prevents nerve root damage in the cervical region which can occur in accidents due to excessive sideways tilting of the head. The collar may be incorporated in a safety helmet 17 and include a third bag 14 at the back. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/05 (2006.01); A42B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/0473 (2013.01); A41D 13/0512 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2291780 A 19960207; GB 2291780 B 19980722; GB 9415573 D0 19940921; AT 200635 T 20010515; AU 2986195 A 19960304; AU 711537 B2 19991014; DE 69520742 D1 20010523; DE 69520742 T2 20010906; EP 0773817 A1 19970521; EP 0773817 B1 20010418; WO 9604048 A1 19960215

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030720

2003-07-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030719

2002-08-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020813

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520742 20010523

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2001-05-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200635 T 20010515

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASVAKIAT, PHANUPONG, ROY

2000-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ASVAKIAT, PHANUPONG, ROY

1997-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970704

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970218

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL SE