Global Patent Index - EP 0774104 B1

EP 0774104 B1 2000-11-15 - GYROSCOPICALLY STABILIZED PROJECTILE SYSTEM FOR USE AGAINST UNDERWATER OBJECTS

Title (en)

GYROSCOPICALLY STABILIZED PROJECTILE SYSTEM FOR USE AGAINST UNDERWATER OBJECTS

Title (de)

GYROSKOPISCH STABILISIERTES PROJEKTILSYSTEM ZUR ANWENDUNG GEGEN UNTERWASSEROBJEKTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PROJECTILE A STABILISATION GYROSCOPIQUE DIRIGE CONTRE DES OBJETS SOUS-MARINS

Publication

EP 0774104 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96918101 A

Priority

  • US 9608926 W
  • US 47442795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9641114A1] A projectile (50) is propelled from a location in air, through an air/water interface, and toward an underwater object (24). The projectile (50) includes a forward end (52) that forms a cavitation void (30) around the projectile (50) in water, avoiding water drag on the remainder of the projectile (50). The projectile (50) further includes a lateral stabilizer (90) that contacts the side of the cavitation void in the event that the projectile (50) yaws into a wall of the cavitation void (30) as it passes through water, producing a restoring force that prevents the projectile (50) from tumbling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/02; F42B 10/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/02 (2006.01); F42B 10/26 (2006.01); F42B 10/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/46 (2013.01); F42B 10/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9641114 A1 19961219; AU 6044796 A 19961230; AU 685027 B2 19980108; CA 2196970 A1 19961219; DE 69610968 D1 20001221; DE 69610968 T2 20010315; EP 0774104 A1 19970521; EP 0774104 B1 20001115; IL 120160 D0 19970610; JP H10501881 A 19980217; NO 970554 A 19970401; NO 970554 D0 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120604

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69610968

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120604

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120605

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120604

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610968 20001221

2000-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990518

1998-11-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAYTHEON COMPANY

1998-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAYTHEON COMPANY

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970528

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE