Global Patent Index - EP 0774106 B1

EP 0774106 B1 2000-03-08 - FULL CALIBER PROJECTILE FOR USE AGAINST UNDERWATER OBJECTS

Title (en)

FULL CALIBER PROJECTILE FOR USE AGAINST UNDERWATER OBJECTS

Title (de)

VOLLKALIBERGESCHOSS ZUR VERWENDUNG GEGEN UNTERWASSERZIELE

Title (fr)

PROJECTILE PLEIN CALIBRE, UTILISE CONTRE DES OBJECTIFS SOUS-MARINS

Publication

EP 0774106 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96919402 A

Priority

  • US 9610244 W
  • US 47442895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9641116A1] A projectile (50) is propelled from a location in air, through anair/water interface, and toward an underwater object (24). The projectile (50) is of a full caliber that is directly received into and fired from a gun barrel (22). The portion of the projectile (50) that contacts the bore of the gun (22) is made of a material that will not unduly damage or be transferred to the bore of the gun upon firing. The projectile (50) includes a forward end stinger head (74) that forms a cavitation void (30) around the projectile (50) in water, minimizing water drag on the remainder of the projectile (50). The projectile (50) further includes a shoulder (90) that contacts the side of the cavitation void (30) in the event that the projectile (50) yaws into a wall of the cavitation void (30) as it passes through water, producing a restoring force that prevents the projectile (50) from tumbling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/02; F42B 10/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/02 (2006.01); F42B 10/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/46 (2013.01); F42B 10/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 4022462 A1 19920116 - DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9641116 A1 19961219; AU 6175396 A 19961230; AU 686954 B2 19980212; CA 2196976 A1 19961219; DE 69606951 D1 20000413; DE 69606951 T2 20001116; EP 0774106 A1 19970521; EP 0774106 B1 20000308; IL 120161 D0 19970610; JP H10501883 A 19980217; NO 970555 A 19970401; NO 970555 D0 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606951

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120603

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120604

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120603

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120603

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606951 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAYTHEON COMPANY

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970805

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970528

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE