Global Patent Index - EP 0774228 B1

EP 0774228 B1 2002-09-18 - Dustbag for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Dustbag for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Filterbeutel für einen Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Sac à poussières pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 0774228 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118162 A

Priority

DE 29518166 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774228A2] The filter bag has a mounting plate (10) provided with a number of superimposed layers, incorporating a flow opening (17), selectively closed by a linear slider (4) incorporated in one of the central layers. The movement of the slider is controlled by a cooperating pivot lever (15) with a rounded nose (22) engaging a curved guide surface formed in one of the side edges of the rectangular slider.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1445 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29518166 U1 19960104; EP 0774228 A2 19970521; EP 0774228 A3 19980415; EP 0774228 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WOLF G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609685 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR SE

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010124

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981005

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR SE

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR SE