Global Patent Index - EP 0774299 B1

EP 0774299 B1 2001-12-12 - Sealing device for the protective hood of a drum mill

Title (en)

Sealing device for the protective hood of a drum mill

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abdichtung einer Schutzhaube eines Mühlenkörpers

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité pour capot protecteur d'un broyeur tubulaire

Publication

EP 0774299 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116398 A

Priority

DE 19542563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774299A1] The seal provides an oil proof seal for the fixed protective hood (6) of a rotating millstone. It includes at least one fixed sealing cord (7) pressed over a compressible prestressed ring (9) against a running track (8) rotating with the millstone. A holding ring (10) is connected to the hood. This ring, with part of the hood's side wall, forms an expansion cavity for the sealing cord and the compressible ring. A brush ring (12) may be connected to the holding ring on the side of the cord facing away from the hood, with its brushes (13) on the running track.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 17/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/181 (2013.01); Y10S 277/903 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774299 A1 19970521; EP 0774299 B1 20011212; DE 19542563 A1 19970522; DK 0774299 T3 20020402; US 5769428 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-12-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-14 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050428

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG AG

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608433 20020124

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR LI

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER GMBH

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000925

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970606

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR LI