Global Patent Index - EP 0774415 B1

EP 0774415 B1 2000-02-02 - Method for applying wicker coverings on bottles, automatic machine to perform this method, pile of wicker coverings for feeding this machine, method and machine for producing this pile

Title (en)

Method for applying wicker coverings on bottles, automatic machine to perform this method, pile of wicker coverings for feeding this machine, method and machine for producing this pile

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Anbringen von Korbgeflechten auf Flaschen, automatische Maschine zum Ausführen dieses Verfahrens, Stapel von Korbgeflechten zur Speisung dieser Maschine, Verfahren und Maschine zur Herstellung dieses Stapels

Title (fr)

Procédé pour placer des clisses sur des bouteilles, machine automatique pour mettre en oeuvre ce procédé, empilage de clisses pour alimenter cette machine, procédé et machine pour réaliser ledit empilage

Publication

EP 0774415 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402434 A

Priority

FR 9513524 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774415A1] The automatic method for putting wicker wire coverings on bottles consists of forming a stack of flattened coverings. The two neighbouring lower wire ends (6) are joined together to ensure mechanical continuity of the different coverings constituting the stack. The lower meshes of each covering are successively separated to provide an opening giving access to each covering interior. A mandrel (17) is engaged successively in each mesh opening to give the covering the shape of the bottle (19a) on which it is to be placed. The mandrel is then extracted from the covering and the bottle engaged in the shaped cover. The bottle is then rotated about its axis, thus twisting the lower wires and connecting them together, and the cover applied against the bottle surface. The lower parts of the wires which pass underneath are then cut.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 21/24; B65D 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/24 (2006.01); B65D 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 23/0892 (2013.01); B65B 21/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774415 A1 19970521; EP 0774415 B1 20000202; DE 69606498 D1 20000309; DE 69606498 T2 20000907; ES 2144219 T3 20000601; FR 2741040 A1 19970516; FR 2741040 B1 19980102; PT 774415 E 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161122

2017-02-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170224

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151114

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160516

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151114

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151114

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606498

2016-05-23 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160516

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144219 T3

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606498 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980408

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971015

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT