Global Patent Index - EP 0774529 B1

EP 0774529 B1 2000-03-29 - Silver-iron material for electrical switch contacts

Title (en)

Silver-iron material for electrical switch contacts

Title (de)

Silber-Eisen-Werkstoff für elektrische Schaltkontakte (I)

Title (fr)

Matériau argent-fer pour contacts de commutateurs électriques

Publication

EP 0774529 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117210 A

Priority

DE 19543222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19543222C1] Ag-Fe material consists of (in wt.%) additives for electrical contacts comprising: 0.5-4.5 Fe, and 0.05-2 MgO, CaO, Y2O3, La-oxide, Ti-oxide, Zr-oxide, Hf-oxide, Ce-oxide, Nb-oxide, Ta-oxide, Cr-oxide, Mn-oxide, Fe-oxide, Zn-oxide, Al2O3, In-oxide, Si-oxide and Sn-oxide, with a balance of Ag. The material contains 0.2-1.5 wt.% oxide components, pref. 0.2-1.2 wt.% oxide of Mg, Ca, Y, La, Ti, Zr, Ce, Nb, Ta, Al and Si. The Fe content is 0.5-2.5 wt.%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 32/00; H01H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 5/06 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/023 (2006.01); H01H 1/0237 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/0237 (2013.01); C22C 32/0021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19543222 C1 19970220; EP 0774529 A1 19970521; EP 0774529 B1 20000329; ES 2146825 T3 20000816; JP H09171735 A 19970630; US 5841044 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071026

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061027

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061027

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061026

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146825 T3

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604827 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DEGUSSA-HUELS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990611

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA-HUELS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970411

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT