Global Patent Index - EP 0774530 B1

EP 0774530 B1 2001-02-21 - Process for producing a heat resistant part from an iron-nickel superalloy

Title (en)

Process for producing a heat resistant part from an iron-nickel superalloy

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines hochtemperaturbeständigen Werkstoffkörpers aus einer Eisen-Nickel-Superlegierung

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une pièce résistante à la chaleur en superalliage fer-nickel

Publication

EP 0774530 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810753 A

Priority

DE 19542919 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774530A1] Production of temperature-resistant material comprises solution calcining and age-hardening a thermally strengthened starting body made of an iron-nickel superalloy of IN 706 type. The solution calcined starting body is cooled at a rate of 0.5-20 degrees C/minute from the calcining temperature to the temperature for age-hardening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C22C 19/05 (2006.01); C22C 30/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/52 (2006.01); C22F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774530 A1 19970521; EP 0774530 B1 20010221; CA 2184850 A1 19970518; CA 2184850 C 20080429; CN 1094994 C 20021127; CN 1165205 A 19971119; DE 19542919 A1 19970522; JP H09170016 A 19970630; RU 2191215 C2 20021020; US 5846353 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111107

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111107

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606461 20010329

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

1998-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971212

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971010

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB