Global Patent Index - EP 0774546 B1

EP 0774546 B1 2000-02-09 - Apparatus for and method controlling engine RPM in hydraulic construction equipment

Title (en)

Apparatus for and method controlling engine RPM in hydraulic construction equipment

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Regeln der Motordrehzahl einer hydraulischen Baumaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour régler la vitesse de rotation du moteur d'un engin de terrassement hydraulique.

Publication

EP 0774546 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95630120 A

Priority

EP 95630120 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774546A1] An apparatus for and a method of controlling the engine RMP in hydraulic construction equipment, being capable of detecting a neutral valve position corresponding to the idle state of the construction equipment and controlling the engine to drive at a low RPM while the construction equipment is in its idle state, thereby achieving a reduced noise generation and reduced fuel consumption. The apparatus includes an engine RPM detecting unit (19) for detecting the RPM of the engine, an engine RPM control unit (21) for controlling the engine RPM, a pressure detecting unit (17) for detecting the pressure in a fluid line (13) connected between a hydraulic pump driven by the engine (15) and main valves (7a-7f) for actuating actuators, and a control unit (23) for determining whether every main valve is in its neutral position, through a functional computation for a pressure value detected by the pressure detecting unit (17) with a predetermined reference value, and controlling the engine RPM controlling unit (21) to decrease the engine RPM when every main valve (7a-7f) is determined as being in its neutral position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774546 A1 19970521; EP 0774546 B1 20000209; DE 69515040 D1 20000316; DE 69515040 T2 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081123

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081123

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081123

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-03-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515040 20000316

2000-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLVO CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT KOREA CO., LTD.

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980925

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960906

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT