Global Patent Index - EP 0774549 B1

EP 0774549 B1 2000-08-23 - Wall element

Title (en)

Wall element

Title (de)

Wandelement

Title (fr)

Elément de paroi

Publication

EP 0774549 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117288 A

Priority

DE 29518217 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774549A1] The wall element has first (12) and second (14) wall leaves, which are spaced from one another by a framework of wooden uprights. The latter has at least one wooden post (16) with two parallel surfaces (20,22) which lie opposite one another, and which are connected to the first and second leaves. The post has a groove (34,36) in each of its opposing side surfaces (17,18). The grooves are parallel to the longitudinal axis of the post, and have a predetermined mutual spacing (S) in the direction which is normal to the parallel surfaces. They extend in planes which are nearly parallel to the parallel surfaces, and overlap in order to form a web (38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2006.01); E04B 2/70 (2006.01); E04C 2/38 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2013.01); E04B 2/707 (2013.01); E04C 2/386 (2013.01); E04B 2/7412 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8423 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8461 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29518217 U1 19960111; AT 195780 T 20000915; EP 0774549 A1 19970521; EP 0774549 B1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 195780 T

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605788

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59605788

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59605788

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59605788

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHWOERER HAUS KG

- Free text: SCHWOERER HAUS KG#HANS-SCHWOERER-STR. 8#72531 HOHENSTEIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCHWOERER HAUS KG#HANS-SCHWOERER-STR. 8#72531 HOHENSTEIN (DE)

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHWORER HAUS K.G.

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-02-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000823

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-01-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-11-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605788 20000928

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19961128;LV PAYMENT 19961128;SI PAYMENT 19961128

2000-08-23 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195780 T 20000915

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHWOERER HAUS KG

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990503

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970415

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 961128;LV PAYMENT 961128;RO;SI PAYMENT 961128