Global Patent Index - EP 0774557 B1

EP 0774557 B1 2001-04-04 - Additional fitting for windows, doors or the like

Title (en)

Additional fitting for windows, doors or the like

Title (de)

Zusatzbeschlag für Fenster, Türen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ferrure supplémentaire pour fenêtres, portes ou similaires

Publication

EP 0774557 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114767 A

Priority

DE 19542552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774557A1] The accessory fitting is applied to doors or windows, and has two parts which can each be attached to a frame or casement. One part is a hook component (1) with at least one hook projection (2), and the other part is a component (3) with one or more openings (4) in which the hook projection can engage. The projection is directed away from the other component, and the position of engagement results from a relative movement of the components in a plane which is parallel to that of the window. The fitting may have a position in which the hook projection grips from above, and may also have a support (5) for the engagement opening, in both the engaged and not-engaged positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0008 (2013.01); E05B 63/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774557 A1 19970521; EP 0774557 B1 20010404; AT 200333 T 20010415; DE 19542552 A1 19970522; DE 19542552 B4 20060126

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090914

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ASSA RUKO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-04-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *ASSA RUKO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME G.M.B.H.VOGELSANGER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20030411

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200333

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000518

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971106

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL