Global Patent Index - EP 0774559 B1

EP 0774559 B1 2001-04-11 - Reinforced hollow section member

Title (en)

Reinforced hollow section member

Title (de)

Hohlkammerprofil mit Armierung

Title (fr)

Profilé creux renforcé

Publication

EP 0774559 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113087 A

Priority

  • DE 19542397 A
  • DE 19547471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5974758A] The apparatus includes a hollow chamber, preferably made from a synthetic material, such as PVC or other plastic, with an insertable reinforcement piece suitable for connecting to window, door or other configurations, such as abutment and frame profiles. The reinforcement piece comprises a unitary rolled sheet metal with one or more screw channels within the reinforcement profile for a front face abutment screw connection. The reinforcement piece further includes at least one shank inwardly extending from the screw channel toward the opposite chamber wall. The reinforcement piece further includes a shank extending around the inner walls of the hollow chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/22; E06B 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/22 (2006.01); E06B 3/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/222 (2013.01); E06B 3/9636 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5974758 A 19991102; CZ 292304 B6 20030917; CZ 9603257 A3 19970611; EP 0774559 A1 19970521; EP 0774559 B1 20010411; ES 2156240 T3 20010616; PL 181971 B1 20011031; PL 315834 A1 19970526; RU 2116425 C1 19980727; TR 9600827 A2 19970621

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59606758

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-05-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100814

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INOUTIC / DECEUNINCK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: INOUTIC / DECEUNINCK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2007-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: INOUTIC / DECEUNINCK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156240

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606758

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WALTER SCHUMACHER RECHTSANWALT

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990419

1998-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN POLYMER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970411

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL