Global Patent Index - EP 0774575 B1

EP 0774575 B1 2001-05-16 - Cast cylinder head for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cast cylinder head for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Gegossener Zylinderkopf einer mehrzylindrigen Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culasse moulée d'un moteur à combustion interne multicylindre

Publication

EP 0774575 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115800 A

Priority

DE 19542495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5730095A] In a cast cylinder head of a multi-cylinder internal combustion engine wherein the cylinder head has a cooling water space including gas flow passages and recesses for receiving spark plugs or fuel injection nozzles and blind bores extending into the cylinder head for receiving valve play adjustment elements and an oil supply passage extending longitudinally through the cylinder head and being in communication with the blind bores for supplying oil thereto, the blind bores are at least pre-cast and the oil supply passages are finish-cast during casting of the cylinder head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/38; F01L 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/38 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19542495 C1 19970116; DE 19542495 C5 20050804; EP 0774575 A1 19970521; EP 0774575 B1 20010516; ES 2158206 T3 20010901; US 5730095 A 19980324

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061003

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158206 T3

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606903 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980210

1997-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970303

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT