Global Patent Index - EP 0774583 B1

EP 0774583 B1 2000-09-13 - Casing for a centrifugal pump

Title (en)

Casing for a centrifugal pump

Title (de)

Gehäuse für eine Kreiselpumpe

Title (fr)

Carter pour une pompe centrifuge

Publication

EP 0774583 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117898 A

Priority

DE 19544173 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774583A1] The casing (1) forms part of an in-line pump with a suction inlet (9) and a pressure outlet (10) at opposite ends. The ports (17) for pressure measurement are arranged on an assembly base (8) to which a differential pressure transducer (7) can be connected. The passages leading to these ports are formed by channels lying within the wall (15) of the casing and opening on to the base. Each channel has a transverse bore (16) accessible from the outside into which the transducer is fitted and sealed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0088 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774583 A1 19970521; EP 0774583 B1 20000913; DE 19544173 C1 19970605

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161107

2016-11-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161107

2016-11-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605874

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151203

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605874 20001019

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000324

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970605

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT