Global Patent Index - EP 0774626 B1

EP 0774626 B1 2002-09-11 - A domestic oven with a continuous front panel

Title (en)

A domestic oven with a continuous front panel

Title (de)

Haushaltherd mit ununterbrochener Frontblende

Title (fr)

Four ménager à panneau frontal continu

Publication

EP 0774626 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201937 A

Priority

IT MI950801 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774626A2] A domestic oven (1) with a continuous front panel (6), in which the door (3) which closes the front of the oven extends upwardly to the top (9) of the body of the oven and covers a control panel, the devices (12, 13) of which are accessible, even when the door is closed, through convenient apertures therein. In addition to satisfying aesthetic considerations, the extension of the door panel to cover the entire front of the oven enables a monitoring window of considerable dimensions to be provided in the door, thus facilitating monitoring of the cooking process from outside. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/02; F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/04 (2013.01); F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774626 A2 19970521; EP 0774626 A3 19990407; EP 0774626 B1 20020911; DE 69623568 D1 20021017; DE 69623568 T2 20030522; IT 237294 Y1 20000905; IT MI950801 U1 19970520; IT MI950801 V0 19951120

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69623568

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120710

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110718

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623568 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-11-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A DOMESTIC OVEN WITH A CONTINUOUS FRONT PANEL

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990414

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT