Global Patent Index - EP 0774644 B1

EP 0774644 B1 2002-09-25 - Cartridge belt

Title (en)

Cartridge belt

Title (de)

Partronengurt

Title (fr)

Bande de cartouches

Publication

EP 0774644 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120194 A

Priority

  • DE 4415112 A
  • DE 4417782 A
  • EP 95104647 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684444A1] The shells (1) are each secured by a plastics ring (7) which has noses (15,17) on opposite sides of the shell. The noses have ratchet slots into which are clipped short connecting elements (9) to form a bandolier of required length. The shells are unclipped by axial movement. The bandolier rings are secured by clip fastening or by welding. The ratchet slots have keyhole shapes to secure the moulded ends of the link elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/29 (2006.01); F42B 39/02 (2006.01); F42B 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0684444 A1 19951129; EP 0684444 B1 19971126; AT 160629 T 19971215; AT 225027 T 20021015; CA 2148143 A1 19951030; CA 2148143 C 19981229; DK 0684444 T3 19980518; DK 0774644 T3 20030203; EP 0774644 A1 19970521; EP 0774644 B1 20020925; ES 2110273 T3 19980201; ES 2182940 T3 20030316; GR 3025541 T3 19980331; JP H0854199 A 19960227; PT 774644 E 20030131; US 5546845 A 19960820

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070329

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071003

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070330

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070330

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070329

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HECKLER & KOCH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-11-12 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-10-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH

- Free text: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#D-78727 OBERNDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#D-78727 OBERNDORF (DE)

2007-03-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070330

2006-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-23 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182940 T3

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403956

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510394 20021031

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 684444

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225027 T 20021015

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980923

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961216

1997-05-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 684444

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE