Global Patent Index - EP 0774764 B1

EP 0774764 B1 2002-09-04 - Electromagnet with movable core member

Title (en)

Electromagnet with movable core member

Title (de)

Elektromagnet mit beweglichem Kernteil

Title (fr)

Electro-aimant avec élément de noyau mobile

Publication

EP 0774764 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118331 A

Priority

DE 19543142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0774764A2] The electromagnet (9) has a magnetic coil (2) enclosing a magnetic armature (1) which is displaced along the longitudinal axis (22) of the magnetic coil, with a damping element (6) for damping its movement. The kinetic energy of the armature is transferred to a movable core (41), which is displaced with the armature over the latter part of its movement, the damping element inserted between the movable core and a stationary core (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/08; H01F 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01F 7/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1615 (2013.01); H01F 7/088 (2013.01); H01F 7/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774764 A2 19970521; EP 0774764 A3 19970903; EP 0774764 B1 20020904; DE 19543142 A1 19970522

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59609622

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHULTZ WOLFGANG E.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-01-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051028

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609622 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI SE

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990811

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971125

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI SE

1997-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHULTZ, WOLFGANG E., DIPL.-ING.

1997-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI SE