Global Patent Index - EP 0774914 B1

EP 0774914 B1 2000-04-12 - Combination of a dispenser and therein contained eating utensils for holding pieces of food

Title (en)

Combination of a dispenser and therein contained eating utensils for holding pieces of food

Title (de)

Kombination aus einem Spender und darin gehaltenen Essgeräten für die Aufnahme von stückigen Speisebestandteilen

Title (fr)

Ensemble distributeur contenant des ustensiles de table permettant de tenir des morceaux d'aliment

Publication

EP 0774914 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96917390 A

Priority

  • DE 29508539 U
  • EP 9602176 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5899356A] PCT No. PCT/EP96/02176 Sec. 371 Date Mar. 27, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Mar. 27, 1997 PCT Filed May 21, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO96/37135 PCT Pub. Date Nov. 28, 1996An eating utensil is provided for holding pieces of food. The eating utensil is provided in the form of gripping tongs (1) with gripper arms (2-3) which can be moved towards each other against a restoring force from an open position into a gripping position. Also provided is a dispenser for the eating utensil. The dispenser holds a plurality of such eating utensils in a stacked relationship within the dispenser. A lowest one of the eating utensils in the dispenser is held in place by the combination of stop elements on the dispenser and catch devices on the utensils. While held in this manner, the lowest eating utensil protrudes partially from the dispensing shaft of the dispenser. The lowest eating utensil therefore can be pulled out of the dispenser for use. The next eating utensil, which was above the lowest eating utensil, then falls to the position of the lowest eating utensil. The combination of the eating utensil and the dispenser thus provides a convenient way of storing and dispensing eating utensils.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 21/10; A47G 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29508539 U1 19950928; AT 191622 T 20000415; AU 5998896 A 19961211; EP 0774914 A1 19970528; EP 0774914 B1 20000412; US 5899356 A 19990504; WO 9637135 A1 19961128

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021201

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-09-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604950 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191622 T 20000415

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980212

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970523

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL